Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessandro Angeloni

Deceased

Archbishop of Urbino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1810BornUrbania
26 May 183322.5Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 184635.4AppointedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
26 Apr 184635.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urbino, Italy
5 Aug 188170.7DiedArchbishop of Urbino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Angeloni (VIAF: 88982827)
Archbishop Alessandro Angeloni (born , died ) Archbishop of Urbino

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 384
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1846, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Dec 2016