Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Boscarini

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1799Born
1 Jun 182223.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 Apr 184950.0AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
7 Oct 184950.5Ordained BishopBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
3 Jun 187273.1DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Boscarini
Bishop Antonio Boscarini (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbania
Ordained BishopCathedral, Urbino, Archdiocese of Urbino

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 102
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1849, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast