Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Félix-Onésime Luquet, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Madurai and Coromandel Coast

Titular Bishop of Esbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1810BornLangres, France
21 May 184231.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
8 Aug 184535.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
8 Aug 184535.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
7 Sep 184535.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Esbus
185140.5ResignedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India
2 Sep 185848.2DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Madurai and Coromandel Coast, India

MicroData Summary for Jean-Félix-Onésime Luquet:
Bishop Jean-Félix-Onésime Luquet M.E.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Madurai and Coromandel Coast

  • a priest for 16.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 189

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013