Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Materozzi

Deceased

Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1811BornNapoli
24 May 183423.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 185342.5SelectedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
12 Sep 185342.6ConfirmedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
18 Sep 185342.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
8 Jul 188473.5DiedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Materozzi:
Bishop Vincenzo Materozzi (born , died ) Bishop of Ruvo e Bitonto

  • a priest for 50.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 487

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013