Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Pace

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy

Titular Bishop of Eumenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1810Born
21 Dec 183323.9Ordained PriestPriest
28 Sep 185545.7AppointedBishop of Amelia, Italy
14 Oct 185545.7Ordained BishopBishop of Amelia, Italy
6 May 188171.3ResignedBishop of Amelia, Italy
12 May 188171.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Eumenia
25 Dec 188878.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Amelia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Pace
Bishop Nicola Pace (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Amelia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolentino
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Porticu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 95, and Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016