Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Abrate

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Terni

Titular Bishop of Sidon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1798BornSommariva del Bosco
7 Apr 182123.1Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 184243.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sabina (-Farfa), Italy
27 Jan 184243.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sidon
6 Feb 184243.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sidon
Feb 1848³49.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Terni, Italy
Feb 1849³50.9DiedApostolic Administrator of Terni, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Abrate (VIAF: 90383449)
Bishop Nicola Abrate (born , died Feb 1849) Apostolic Administrator of Terni

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1846
  • ob/c2+: CB, 8 Apr 2012
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Nov 2016