Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Perpetuo Guasco, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt

Titular Bishop of FesseŽ

Apostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1803¹Born
7 Jun 183936.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt
7 Jun 183936.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Egypt, Arab Republic of
7 Jun 183936.4AppointedTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
29 Sep 183936.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of FesseŽ
26 Aug 185956.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Egitto, Egypt

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Perpetuo Guasco
Bishop Perpetuo Guasco O.F.M. Obs. (born 1803, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Egitto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSolero, Piťmont

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 194
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1839, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016