Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Athanase Khouzan

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

Titular Bishop of Maronea


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Oct 1836Ordained PriestPriest
2 Oct 1855AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt
2 Oct 1855AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
23 Dec 1855Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
17 Feb 1864DiedVicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Athanase Khouzan
Bishop Athanase Khouzan (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Alexandria {Alessandria}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPropaganda, Cairo

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 8.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: CB
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111, Number 9,790
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 368
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1855, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016