Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Pappalardo

Deceased

Official Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

Titular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1903BornBuccheri, Italy
15 Aug 192522.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Aug 194845.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Iran
7 Aug 194845.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria
29 Aug 194845.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Apamea in Syria
19 Mar 195350.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Syria
4 Jul 195350.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Alep [Beroea, Halab], Syria
195854.8AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
196460.8ResignedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
6 Aug 196663.4DiedOfficial Emeritus of the Secretariat of State

MicroData Summary for Paolo Pappalardo:
Archbishop Paolo Pappalardo (born , died ) Official Emeritus of State

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015