Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zaya Dachtou

Deceased

Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran

Bishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1912Born
27 Mar 193724.4Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jul 195138.7AppointedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
14 Jul 195138.7AppointedBishop of Salmas {Shahpour} (Chaldean), Iran
30 Dec 195139.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran
15 Aug 197259.8DiedArchbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh} (Chaldean), Iran

MicroData Summary for Zaya Dachtou
Archbishop Zaya Dachtou (born , died ) Archbishop of Urmyā {Rezayeh}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKhosrova

  • a priest for 35.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,375
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,411
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018