Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luigi Accogli

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Syria

Titular Archbishop of Treba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1917BornAndrano, Italy
6 Mar 194325.6Ordained PriestPriest
16 Oct 196750.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Treba
16 Oct 196750.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to China
26 Nov 196750.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Treba
29 Sep 197053.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ecuador
6 Jul 197961.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bangladesh
17 Jun 198870.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Syria
18 Feb 199375.5RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Syria
21 Jun 200486.8DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Syria

MicroData Summary for Luigi Accogli:
Archbishop Luigi Accogli (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Syria

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013