Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Holguer López Mayorga

Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1926 BornMocha
29 Jun 195124.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Mar 197346.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
30 Mar 197346.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
29 Apr 197346.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae in Numidia
3 Aug 197447.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
24 May 198053.7SucceededBishop of Guaranda, Ecuador
18 Jun 199063.8AppointedBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
19 Feb 200376.4RetiredBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Raúl Holguer López Mayorga
Bishop Raúl Holguer López Mayorga (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Latacunga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016