Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Victoriano Naranjo Tovar

Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1941 BornPujilí, Cotopaxi
2 Jul 196523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Latacunga, Ecuador
19 Feb 200361.6AppointedBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
25 Mar 200361.7Ordained BishopBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
30 Nov 201675.4RetiredBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Victoriano Naranjo Tovar
Bishop José Victoriano Naranjo Tovar (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Latacunga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Latacunga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,358
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 30 Nov 2016