Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Mario Ruiz Navas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Portoviejo, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1930Born
17 Apr 195423.7Ordained PriestPriest
5 Dec 196838.3AppointedBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
12 Jan 196938.4Ordained BishopBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
6 Aug 198959.0AppointedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
25 Feb 199463.5AppointedArchbishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador
6 Aug 200777.0RetiredArchbishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador
9 Dec 202090.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Portoviejo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Mario Ruiz Navas
Archbishop José Mario Ruiz Navas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Portoviejo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePujilí
Ordained BishopPlaza Santo Domingo, Latacunga, Diocese of Latacunga
Death PlacePujilí
Buried Place (Original)Church, Pujilí

  • a priest for 66.6 years
  • a bishop for 51.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Aug 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 263
  • d: CB, 10 Dec 2020
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 246, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 5 Jul 2021

Quantcast