Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Ovidio Vera Intriago

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo

Titular Bishop of Autenti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1942BornJunín
28 Jun 197027.7Ordained PriestPriest of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
16 Dec 199250.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
16 Dec 199250.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Autenti
2 Feb 199350.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Autenti
21 Apr 201471.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Francisco Ovidio Vera Intriago:
Bishop Francisco Ovidio Vera Intriago (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,108
  • d: CB, 21 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Apr 2014