Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Alfredo Carvajal Rosales

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1913Born
4 Jul 193723.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 195541.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
28 Jul 195541.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Coptus
28 Oct 195542.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coptus
20 Aug 196349.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
17 Feb 196753.3SucceededBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
6 Aug 198975.8RetiredBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
25 Apr 200389.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Alfredo Carvajal Rosales
Bishop Luis Alfredo Carvajal Rosales (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbarra

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 97
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast