Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leonidas Eduardo Proaño Villalba

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Riobamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1910BornS. Antonio di Ibarra
29 Jun 193626.4Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 195444.1AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
26 May 195444.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
20 Mar 198575.1RetiredBishop of Riobamba, Ecuador
31 Aug 198878.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Riobamba, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Leonidas Eduardo Proaño Villalba:
Bishop Leonidas Eduardo Proaño Villalba (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Riobamba

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013