Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Barbisotti, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas

Titular Bishop of Caunus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1904BornOsio Sotto, Italy
15 Jul 192823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
14 Nov 195753.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador
14 Nov 195753.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caunus
2 Feb 195853.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caunus
17 Sep 197267.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Angelo Barbisotti:
Bishop Angelo Barbisotti F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013