Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximiliano Spiller, C.S.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Myrica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1903Born
27 Aug 191916.3ProfessedMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
5 Sep 192522.3Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of Saint Joseph
11 Jun 192724.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Saint Joseph
12 Nov 194138.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
12 Nov 194138.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrica
28 Dec 194138.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrica
27 Apr 197875.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Napo, Ecuador
27 Jul 199188.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Maximiliano Spiller
Bishop Maximiliano Spiller C.S.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Napo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarrÚ, Italy

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1941, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018