Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cesar Antonio Mosquera Corral

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1896BornRiobamba
1 Jan 192124.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 193640.4AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
24 Jan 193740.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
11 Oct 195458.4AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
22 Jan 195659.7AppointedArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
11 Mar 196972.8RetiredArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
11 Mar 196972.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Forum Novum
27 Dec 197074.6ResignedTitular Archbishop of Forum Novum
26 Apr 197175.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Cesar Antonio Mosquera Corral:
Archbishop Cesar Antonio Mosquera Corral (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

  • a priest for 50.3 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015