Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Hermida Ortega

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Aug 1863BornCuenca
4 Jun 189531.8Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
10 Mar 191854.5AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
9 Nov 191956.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
30 Sep 195693.1DiedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Daniel Hermida Ortega:
Bishop Daniel Hermida Ortega (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013