Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Comin, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Obba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1874Born
14 Apr 190025.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Mar 192045.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Méndez y Gualaquiza, Ecuador
8 Mar 192045.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
17 Oct 192046.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
17 Aug 196388.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Domingo Comin
Bishop Domingo Comin S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Méndez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Lucia di Budoja, Italy

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast