Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Maria Ordóñez Crespo

Deceased

Bishop of Bolivar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1872BornCuenca
19 Dec 189624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Cuenca, Ecuador
4 Dec 191644.0AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
28 Oct 191744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
5 Dec 193058.0AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
7 Jan 195481.1DiedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Alberto Maria Ordóñez Crespo:
Bishop Alberto Maria Ordóñez Crespo (born , died ) Bishop of Bolivar

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015