Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardino Carlos Guillermo Honorato Cardinal Echeverría Ruiz, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1912BornCotacachi
4 Jul 193724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Oct 194936.9AppointedBishop of Ambato, Ecuador
4 Dec 194937.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ambato, Ecuador
10 Apr 196956.4AppointedArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
8 Dec 198270.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Galápagos, Ecuador
18 May 198471.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Galápagos, Ecuador
7 Dec 198977.1RetiredArchbishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
1990²77.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ibarra, Ecuador
26 Nov 199482.0Elevated to Cardinal
26 Nov 199482.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
25 Jul 199582.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Ibarra, Ecuador
6 Apr 200087.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Carlos Guillermo Honorato Echeverría Ruiz:
Cardinal Bernardino Carlos Guillermo Honorato Echeverría Ruiz O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Guayaquil

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
  • a cardinal for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 109
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013