Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Oswaldo Pérez Calderón

Deceased

Bishop of Ibarra, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1926Born
25 Jun 195024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Ibarra, Ecuador
21 Aug 198458.5AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
25 Nov 198458.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
22 Sep 198963.6DiedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Oswaldo Pérez Calderón
Bishop Luis Oswaldo Pérez Calderón (born , died ) Bishop of Ibarra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Roque

  • a priest for 39.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Apr 2017