Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Mauricio Paz Hurtado

Bishop of Latacunga, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1962 Born
29 Jun 198825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Ibarra, Ecuador
30 Nov 201654.0AppointedBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador
20 Jan 201754.1Ordained BishopBishop of Latacunga, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Mauricio Paz Hurtado
Bishop Giovanni Mauricio Paz Hurtado (born ) Bishop of Latacunga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotacachi
Ordained BishopCathedral, Latacunga, Diocese of Latacunga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Latacunga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2016
  • c1: CB, 30 Nov 2016
  • ob: CB, 2 Dec 2016
  • ob/c2+: CB, 21 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jan 2017