Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Clímaco Jacinto Zarauz Carrillo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Azogues, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1926Born
25 Jun 195024.3Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 199064.0AppointedBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
20 Apr 199064.1Ordained BishopBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
14 Feb 200477.9RetiredBishop of Azogues, Ecuador
21 Jul 201791.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Azogues, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Clímaco Jacinto Zarauz Carrillo
Bishop Clímaco Jacinto Zarauz Carrillo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Azogues

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Antonio de Ibarra
Death PlaceIbarra

  • a priest for 67.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,588
  • d: CB, 22 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jul 2017