Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Francisco Mosquera Barreiro, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Asuoremixta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1909Born
4 Jul 193727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
16 Mar 195949.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Zamora, Ecuador
21 Apr 196454.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zamora, Ecuador
21 Apr 196454.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Asuoremixta
12 Jul 196454.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Asuoremixta
10 Sep 198273.0ResignedVicar Apostolic of Zamora, Ecuador
26 Sep 199081.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Jorge Francisco Mosquera Barreiro
Bishop Jorge Francisco Mosquera Barreiro O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Zamora

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTumbaco

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1964, Page 771

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018