Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germán Trajano Pavón Puente

Bishop Emeritus of Ambato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Oct 1936 BornQuito
29 Jun 196023.6Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 198952.2AppointedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
25 Feb 198952.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
19 Apr 200164.4AppointedBishop of Ambato, Ecuador
20 Jan 201578.2RetiredBishop of Ambato, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Germán Trajano Pavón Puente:
Bishop Germán Trajano Pavón Puente (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ambato

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ambato.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,454
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124, Number 11,176
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Jan 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 23 Mar 2015