Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Antonio Sánchez Armijos, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of Machala


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1943 BornOlmedo
1 Aug 196926.0Professed (Perpetual Vows)Member of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Jan 197531.5Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Jun 200258.9AppointedBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
27 Jul 200259.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tulcán, Ecuador
22 Feb 201066.6AppointedBishop of Machala, Ecuador
1 May 201066.8InstalledBishop of Machala, Ecuador
22 Oct 201269.2ResignedBishop of Machala, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Sánchez Armijos:
Bishop Luis Antonio Sánchez Armijos S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Machala

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Machala.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,234
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014