Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfredo José Espinoza Mateus, S.D.B.

Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1958 Born
24 Jan 197920.7ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Aug 198426.3Solemn VowsMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
17 Dec 198830.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
20 Dec 201355.6AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
18 Jan 201455.7Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
5 Apr 201960.9AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
2 May 201961.0InstalledArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Alfredo José Espinoza Mateus
Archbishop Alfredo José Espinoza Mateus S.D.B. (born ) Archbishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuayaquil
Ordained BishopCathedral, Loja, Diocese of Loja

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Quito.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 23 Dec 2013
  • c2+: CB, 16 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,073
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Apr 2019
  • prof/c1: CB, 5 Apr 2019
  • i: AM, 8 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 9 Apr 2019

Quantcast