Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julio Parrilla Díaz

Bishop of Riobamba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1946 BornOrense, Spain
30 Mar 197529.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
1981²34.8IncardinatedPriest of Salamanca, Spain
18 Apr 200862.1AppointedBishop of Loja, Ecuador
5 Jun 200862.2Ordained BishopBishop of Loja, Ecuador
12 Jan 201366.8AppointedBishop of Riobamba, Ecuador
2 Mar 201366.9InstalledBishop of Riobamba, Ecuador

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julio Parrilla Díaz:
Bishop Julio Parrilla Díaz (born ) Bishop of Riobamba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Riobamba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,756
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2013
  • i: CB, 15 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 31 Mar 2014