Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jaime Oswaldo Castillo Villacrés

Vicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1973 Born
11 Sep 199824.9Ordained PriestPriest of Loja, Ecuador
17 Nov 202047.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador
23 Jan 202147.3Ordained BishopVicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Jaime Oswaldo Castillo Villacrés
Father Jaime Oswaldo Castillo Villacrés (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGozanamá, Diocese of Loja

Please contact the Father through the Vicariate Apostolic of Zamora en Ecuador.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 19 Nov 2020

Quantcast