Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Néstor Montesdeoca Becerra, S.D.B.

Vicar Apostolic of Méndez

Titular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1957 BornEl Pan
24 May 198225.0ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
30 Aug 198629.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
15 Apr 200850.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Méndez, Ecuador
15 Apr 200850.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
21 Jun 200851.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Néstor Montesdeoca Becerra:
Bishop Néstor Montesdeoca Becerra S.D.B. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Méndez

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Méndez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,764

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015