Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Félix Heredia Zurita, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guayaquil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1881BornLicto
24 Aug 191029.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Dec 193756.9AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
6 Feb 193857.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
2 Aug 195473.5DiedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Félix Heredia Zurita:
Bishop José Félix Heredia Zurita S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Guayaquil

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013