Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Rafael González y Calixto

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1839Born
24 Sep 186424.9Ordained PriestPriest
29 Sep 187636.9AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
26 Nov 187637.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
15 Jun 189353.6AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador
15 Jun 189353.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Synnada in Phrygia
14 Jul 189353.7SucceededArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
27 Mar 190464.4DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Pedro Rafael González y Calixto
Archbishop Pedro Rafael González y Calixto (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Death PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 318, and Page 475
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 531
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017