Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arsenio Andrade y Landázuri

Deceased

Bishop of Bolivar, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1825³Born
14 Jan 185529.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
21 Jan 185529.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 188459.1AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
25 Jan 188559.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
14 Oct 190580.0DiedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arsenio Andrade y Landázuri (VIAF: 307460869)
Bishop Arsenio Andrade y Landázuri (born , died ) Bishop of Bolivar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUyumbicho, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,548
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 483
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 320
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017