Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remigio Estéves de Toral

Deceased

Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1814Born
22 Jul 186147.0AppointedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
10 Nov 186147.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
2 May 188368.8DiedBishop of Cuenca, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Remigio Estéves de Toral (VIAF: 73460231)
Bishop Remigio Estéves de Toral (born , died ) Bishop of Cuenca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopQuito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 221
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017