Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Ignacio Ordóñez

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1829¹Born
Dec 1855³26.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 186637.4AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
23 Sep 186637.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
1879¹50.0ResignedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
3 Jul 188253.5AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
14 Jul 189364.5DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Ordóñez (VIAF: 304921723)
Archbishop José Ignacio Ordóñez (born 1829, died ) Archbishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuenca, Diocese of Cuenca
Ordained BishopCuenca, Diocese of Cuenca

  • a priest for 37.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475, and Page 483
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017