Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María Riofrío y Valdivieso

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1794Born
29 Sep 182126.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Mar 185358.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
10 Mar 185358.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
29 Jun 185358.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pompeiopolis in Cilicia
22 Jul 186166.6AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
2 Apr 186772.3ResignedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
2 Apr 186772.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Loja, Ecuador
1875¹80.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Loja, Ecuador
22 Oct 187782.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Quito, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José María Riofrío y Valdivieso
Archbishop José María Riofrío y Valdivieso (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCariamanga (Loja)

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1858
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 348, and Page 462
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017