Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Tola y Avilés

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1811Born
1839²27.7Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 186352.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
1 Oct 186352.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
15 Nov 186352.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
6 Mar 187159.9AppointedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
Jul 1884³73.2ResignedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
1888¹76.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luis Tola y Avilés
Bishop Luis Tola y Avilés (born , died 1888) Bishop Emeritus of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuayaquil, Diocese of Guayaquil
Ordained BishopGuayaquil, Diocese of Guayaquil

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 147, and Page 468
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jan 2017