Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Aguirre

Deceased

Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1811¹Born
22 Jul 186150.5AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
3 Nov 186150.8Ordained BishopBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
14 May 186857.3DiedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Aguirre
Bishop Tomás Aguirre (born 1811, died ) Bishop of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuayaquil, Diocese of Guayaquil
Ordained BishopLima, Archdiocese of Lima, Peru

  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1868
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 295
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017