Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Manuel García Tejada

Deceased

Bishop of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1815¹Born
6 Jun 186651.4AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
11 Nov 186651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
4 Oct 186954.7DiedBishop of Pasto, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel García Tejada (VIAF: 260775790)
Bishop Juan Manuel García Tejada (born 1815, died ) Bishop of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Fe
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guayaquil, Diocese of Guayaquil, Ecuador

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1866, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Feb 2017