Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Lizarzabaru y Borja, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jun 1833Born
22 Dec 186027.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Nov 186936.4AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
12 Jun 187036.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
17 Oct 187744.3DiedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José María Lizarzabaru y Borja
Bishop José María Lizarzabaru y Borja S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuano, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopGesù, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 16.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,870, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast