Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Ignacio Checa y Barba

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1829Born
11 Mar 185525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
22 Jul 186131.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Cuenca, Ecuador
22 Jul 186131.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lystra
29 Dec 186132.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lystra
6 Aug 186637.0AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
16 Mar 186838.6AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
30 Mar 187747.6DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio Checa y Barba (VIAF: 315100986)
Archbishop José Ignacio Checa y Barba (born , died ) Archbishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 22.0 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 317, and Page 356
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 475
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Feb 2017