Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José María de Jesús Yerovi Pintado, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1819BornQuito
29 May 184526.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Quito, Ecuador
31 May 184526.1Ordained PriestPriest of Quito, Ecuador
25 Sep 186546.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador
25 Sep 186546.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
5 Aug 186647.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cydonia (Agia, Canea)
2 Apr 186748.0SucceededArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
20 Jun 186748.2DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for José María de Jesús Yerovi Pintado:
Archbishop José María de Jesús Yerovi Pintado O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Quito

  • a priest for 22.1 years
  • a bishop for .9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 81, and Page 475

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013