Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Schumacher, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1839Born
21 Dec 186122.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
14 Jun 186222.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Mar 188545.5AppointedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
31 May 188545.7Ordained BishopBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador
15 Jul 190262.8DiedBishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio), Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Pedro Schumacher (VIAF: 309782384)
Bishop Pedro Schumacher C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Portoviejo (Porto Vecchio)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKerpen, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 468
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017