Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Isidoro Barriga

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1854Born
2 Apr 187622.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Guayaquil, Ecuador
29 Jul 187723.3Ordained PriestPriest of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Jun 189036.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Guayaquil, Ecuador
26 Jun 189036.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
5 Oct 189036.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
1894¹39.7DiedApostolic Administrator of Guayaquil, Ecuador

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Isidoro Barriga
Bishop Isidoro Barriga (born , died 1894) Apostolic Administrator of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJipijapa, Diocese of Guayaquil
Ordained BishopGuayaquil, Diocese of Guayaquil

  • a priest for 16.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017