Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Federico González y Suárez

Deceased

Archbishop of Quito, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1845Born
30 Jul 189550.5AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
8 Dec 189550.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
14 Dec 190560.9AppointedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
6 Jul 190661.5InstalledArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador
3 Dec 191772.9DiedArchbishop of Quito, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Federico González y Suárez (VIAF: 61691078)
Archbishop Federico González y Suárez (born , died ) Archbishop of Quito

EventPlace
Birth PlaceQuito, Archdiocese of Quito
Ordained BishopCathedral, Quito, Archdiocese of Quito

  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1918
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,550
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 318
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jun 2017