Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulpiano María Pérez y Quiñones

Deceased

Bishop of Bolivar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1863BornQuito
11 Jan 190743.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Quito, Ecuador
11 Jan 190743.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
8 May 190743.8AppointedBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
19 May 190743.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ibarra, Ecuador
4 Dec 191653.3AppointedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador
27 Dec 191855.4DiedBishop of Bolivar, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Ulpiano María Pérez y Quiñones:
Bishop Ulpiano María Pérez y Quiñones (born , died ) Bishop of Bolivar

  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1917
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 65, and Page 206
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 320
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013